Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Standard Deduction - Inflation Adjustment
Sponsored by
Senators Eckardt, Bates, Edwards, Guzzone, Hershey, Hough, Jennings, Madaleno, and Serafini
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing the minimum and maximum limitation amounts of the standard deduction allowed under the State income tax for taxable years beginning after December 31, 2018, by a certain cost-of-living adjustment.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0237 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax - Standard Deduction - Inflation Adjustment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Income Tax - Standard Deduction - Inflation Adjustment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/24/2018
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
58
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Income Tax - Standard Deduction - Inflation Adjustment
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/29/2018 3/29/2018 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/29/2018 3/26/2018 Favorable Adopted 57
Senate 3/29/2018 3/26/2018 Second Reading Passed 57
Text - Third - Income Tax - Standard Deduction - Inflation Adjustment
Senate 3/30/2018 3/27/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 58
House 4/02/2018 3/24/2018 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 58
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-217 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM