Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore County - Orphans' Court Judges - Compensation
Sponsored by
Baltimore County Senators (By Request - Baltimore County Orphans' Court)
Status
In the House - Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing provisions of law establishing the annual compensation of the judges of the Orphans' Court for Baltimore County; requiring the annual compensation of the judges of the Orphans' Court for Baltimore County to be as set by the County Executive and the County Council in accordance with specified provisions of the Baltimore County Code; applying the Act; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1180
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2015
Legislative Date
2/23/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/26/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/24/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/25/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/20/2015 2/23/2015 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/05/2015 3/06/2015 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/06/2015 3/06/2015 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/25/2015 3/26/2015 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/26/2015 3/23/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 50
Senate 3/26/2015 3/23/2015 Second Reading Passed 50
Senate 3/27/2015 3/24/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 51
House 3/27/2015 3/25/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 55
House 4/11/2015 4/11/2015 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM