Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Transportation - Transit Service - State Grants
Sponsored by
Senators Madaleno and King
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering a provision of law concerning the amount of a certain grant that the Department of Transportation is required to provide to the Washington Suburban Transit District for a share of the regional transit operating deficits of the regional transit system for which the District is responsible; altering provisions of law concerning the amount of an annual grant that the Department is required to provide to Prince George's County and Montgomery County for eligible local bus service; etc.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0963 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Transportation - Transit Service - State Grants
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Transportation - Transit Service - State Grants
Senate 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-205, 10-207 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM