Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Insurance - Motor Vehicle Modifications for Permanently Wheelchair Dependent Individuals - Coverage
Sponsored by
Senator Guzzone
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring insurers, nonprofit health service plans, and health maintenance organizations that provide specified health insurance benefits under specified health insurance policies or contracts to provide coverage one time for adaptive equipment for or other modifications to the motor vehicle of a permanently wheelchair dependent individual under specified circumstances; and providing that the required coverage may be subject to specified deductibles or coinsurance requirements.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0865
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/11/2016 3/14/2016 Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-850 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM