Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Property - Actions to Quiet Title
Sponsored by
Senator Waugh
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a specified action to be brought to establish title against adverse claims to property; providing for jurisdiction, venue, and the application of specified statutes and rules in an action under the Act; establishing that an action is commenced by filing a complaint; establishing requirements for a complaint, an answer to a complaint, a cross-complaint, naming of defendants, joinder of parties, and service of process in an action under the Act; providing for the effect of a judgment; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1129
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2015
Legislative Date
2/23/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/20/2015 2/23/2015 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/13/2015 3/16/2015 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/16/2015 3/16/2015 Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-108, 14-601 through 14-628 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM