Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Crabs - Harvest Times - Trotlines and Crab Pots
Sponsored by
Senator Waugh
Status
In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Natural Resources to adopt regulations that provide the option to a tidal fish licensee authorized to catch crabs using trotlines and crab pots to work specified hours from July 15 through September 15 of any year; requiring a licensee who chooses a specified hours-of-work option to notify the Department of that choice by a specified date; prohibiting a licensee who chooses a specified hours-of-work option from changing that option until the following license year; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0915
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {720311/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (139-0)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Senators Waugh, Zucker, and Bates
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
House Refuses to Recede
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Delegates O'Donnell, Stein, and Gilchrist
Proceedings
70
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/11/2016 3/14/2016 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/15/2016 3/15/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 44
Senate 3/15/2016 3/15/2016 Second Reading Passed 44
Senate 3/16/2016 3/16/2016 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 45
House 3/17/2016 3/14/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation 46
House 3/21/2016 3/21/2016 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/22/2016 3/21/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 3/22/2016 3/21/2016 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/05/2016 4/06/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/07/2016 3/31/2016 Favorable with Amendments {720311/1 Report Adopted 63
House 4/07/2016 3/31/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63
House 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (139-0) 68
Senate 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments 65
Senate 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Senate Requests House Recede 65
Senate 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Conference Committee Appointed 65
Senate 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Senators Waugh, Zucker, and Bates 65
House 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 House Refuses to Recede 70
House 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Conference Committee Appointed 70
House 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Delegates O'Donnell, Stein, and Gilchrist 70
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM