Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Educational Institutions - Personal Electronic Account - Privacy Protection
Sponsored by
Senators Young, Montgomery, Rosapepe, and Shank
Status
In the House - First Reading Appropriations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting an educational institution from requiring, requesting, suggesting, or causing a student, an applicant, or a prospective student to grant access to, allow observation of, or disclose information that allows access to or observation of the individual's personal electronic account; prohibiting an educational institution from compelling, as a condition of acceptance or participation in specified activities, an individual to add specified individuals to a list of contacts or to change privacy settings; etc.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0434 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {544638/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
51
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2013 2/06/2013 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/18/2013 3/18/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/19/2013 3/17/2013 Favorable with Amendments {544638/1 Report Adopted 48
Senate 3/19/2013 3/17/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Senate 3/21/2013 3/19/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 50
House 3/21/2013 3/18/2013 First Reading Appropriations 51
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   26-401 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM