Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Coram Nobis - Time for Filing
Sponsored by
Senator Smith
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that, unless good cause is shown, a petition for writ of error coram nobis may not be filed more than 3 years after the petitioner knew or should have known that the petitioner faces a significant collateral consequence from the conviction that is the basis for the petition.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0891
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0810 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Coram Nobis - Time for Filing
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
48BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {623022/1 (Senator Cassilly)
Proceedings
48BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Cassilly) Adopted
Proceedings
48BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {623022/1 (Senator Cassilly) Rejected (19-27)
Proceedings
48CClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48CClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure - Coram Nobis - Time for Filing
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/18/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (29-16)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (85-50)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2018
Legislative Date
5/25/2018
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Coram Nobis - Time for Filing
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable Adopted 48BClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Floor Amendment {623022/1 (Senator Cassilly) 48BClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Cassilly) Adopted 48BClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2018 3/17/2018 Floor Amendment {623022/1 (Senator Cassilly) Rejected (19-27) 48CClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2018 3/17/2018 Second Reading Passed 48CClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure - Coram Nobis - Time for Filing
Senate 3/20/2018 3/18/2018 Third Reading Passed (29-16) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2018 3/17/2018 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2018 4/02/2018 Rereferred to Judiciary
House 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 61AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Third Reading Passed (85-50) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Returned Passed 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/25/2018 5/25/2018 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Governor's Veto Letter Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM
Click to return on the top page