Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
General Assembly and Department of Legislative Services - Reduction in Paper Use
Sponsored by
Senators Klausmeier, Benson, Ferguson, Garagiola, Glassman, Kittleman, Madaleno, Manno, Middleton, Ramirez, Rosapepe, and Simonaire
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 9:00 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Legislative Policy Committee to study how the amount of paper used by the General Assembly and the Department of Legislative Services can be reduced by 80% by the beginning of 2018 by changing specified rules, procedures, and provisions of law; and requiring the Committee to prepare specified bills and rule changes for introduction or consideration by the General Assembly in the 2016 Session.
Committees
Original:
Rules
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2013
Legislative Date
3/06/2013
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 9:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2013 2/06/2013 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/06/2013 3/06/2013 Hearing 3/13 at 9:00 a.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM