Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
St. Mary's County - Personal Property Tax - Exemption
Sponsored by
Senator Waugh
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Synopsis
Exempting from the St. Mary's County property tax specified personal property purchased by businesses during the period from July 1, 2016, to June 30, 2018; exempting specified personal property from the St. Mary's County property tax beginning on July 1, 2018; providing that specified personal property remains subject to the St. Mary's County property tax; etc.
Committees
Original:
Rules
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0184
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2015
Legislative Date
2/23/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/20/2015 2/23/2015 First Reading Senate Rules
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM