Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Information Act - Electronic Mail Addresses - Web Site Notice
Sponsored by
Senator Getty
Status
In the Senate - Referred to interim study by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring specified governmental units to post on the Web sites of the units a specified statement notifying the public that electronic mail addresses are public records; and defining "governmental unit".
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2013
Legislative Date
2/15/2013
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Referred to interim study by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2013 2/06/2013 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/15/2013 2/15/2013 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/26/2013 3/27/2013 Referred to interim study by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-619.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM