Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment - Newsprint Recycling Board - Repeal and Transfer of Authority
Sponsored by
Senator Conway
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 630
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the provisions of law that establish the Newsprint Recycling Board; authorizing the Secretary of the Environment, rather than the Board, to exempt a publisher from certain recycled content requirements under certain circumstances; providing that the Secretary's failure to act on a certain application under certain circumstances, rather than the Board's failure to act, is an approval of the application; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/10/2018
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 630
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Environment - Newsprint Recycling Board - Repeal and Transfer of Authority
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Favorable Adopted 42
Senate 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Second Reading Passed 42
Text - Third - Environment - Newsprint Recycling Board - Repeal and Transfer of Authority
Senate 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 44
House 3/13/2018 3/10/2018 Referred Environment and Transportation 44
House 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 59
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 62
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Returned Passed 64
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 630
Text - Chapter - Environment - Newsprint Recycling Board - Repeal and Transfer of Authority
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-1707 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM