Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Courts - Baltimore City Sheriff and Fees for Filing and Service of Process
Sponsored by
Senator Conway
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 325
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the type and the number of specified employee positions to which the Baltimore City Sheriff may appoint employees; increasing a specified annual expense allowance for specified deputy sheriffs; altering specified surcharges on filing fees in the District Court in Baltimore City; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/22/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2013
Legislative Date
3/22/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
55A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2013
Legislative Date
3/26/2013
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {190716/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (110-29)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/02/2013
Legislative Date
5/02/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 325
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2013 2/07/2013 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/21/2013 3/22/2013 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/22/2013 3/20/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 51
Senate 3/22/2013 3/20/2013 Second Reading Passed 51
Senate 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 52
House 3/26/2013 3/22/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters 55A
House 3/26/2013 3/26/2013 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/04/2013 4/05/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
House 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Favorable with Amendments {190716/1 Report Adopted 64
House 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64
House 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (110-29) 66
Senate 4/08/2013 4/04/2013 Senate Concur - House Amendments 66
Senate 4/08/2013 4/04/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 66
Senate 4/08/2013 4/04/2013 Passed Enrolled 66
Post Passage 5/02/2013 5/02/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 325
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-309, 7-301, 7-402 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM