Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Hotel Room Tax - Convention Center Promotion and Operations
Sponsored by
Senator Conway (By Request - Baltimore City Administration)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 597
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Extending, through fiscal year 2022, provisions requiring that at least 40% of the proceeds from any hotel room tax imposed by Baltimore City be appropriated by the Mayor and City Council to Visit Baltimore for the marketing and operations of the Baltimore City Convention Center and for tourism promotion; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1030
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0243 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Baltimore City - Hotel Room Tax - Convention Center Promotion
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {409038/1 Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-2)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/20/2017
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-2)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 597
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Baltimore City - Hotel Room Tax - Convention Center Promotion
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/14/2017 3/14/2017 Favorable with Amendments {409038/1 Adopted 43
Senate 3/14/2017 3/14/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43
Text - Third - Baltimore City - Hotel Room Tax - Convention Center Promotion and Operations
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Third Reading Passed (44-2) 45
House 3/16/2017 3/13/2017 Referred Ways and Means 47
House 3/20/2017 3/20/2017 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/31/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 61
House 4/04/2017 3/28/2017 Third Reading Passed (137-2) 62
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Returned Passed 59
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 597
Text - Chapter - Baltimore City - Hotel Room Tax - Convention Center Promotion and Operations
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM