Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Real Estate Commission – Brokers – Business Succession in the Event of Disability
Sponsored by
Senators Conway, Bates, Kagan, Pinsky, Simonaire, Young, and Zucker
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 77
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing any adult family member of a disabled real estate broker to carry on the business of the disabled broker for 6 months for certain purposes subject to certain qualifications; requiring certain family members to surrender a certain certificate and pocket card and submit certain information to the State Real Estate Commission under certain circumstances; defining "disability" as a total and permanent disability that renders a broker unable to perform real estate brokerage services; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1482
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {934335/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/10/2018
Legislative Date
4/10/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 77
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - State Real Estate Commission – Brokers – Business Succession in the Event of Disability
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Favorable with Amendments {934335/1 Adopted 40
Senate 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40
Text - Third - State Real Estate Commission – Brokers – Business Succession in the Event of Disability
Senate 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 42
House 3/09/2018 3/09/2018 Referred Economic Matters 43
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/28/2018 3/28/2018 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/28/2018 3/21/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 55
House 3/29/2018 3/22/2018 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 56
Senate 3/30/2018 3/27/2018 Returned Passed 58
Post Passage 4/10/2018 4/10/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 77
Text - Chapter - State Real Estate Commission – Brokers – Business Succession in the Event of Disability
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM