Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Judges - Mandatory Retirement Age
Sponsored by
Senators Miller and Jennings
Status
In the House - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Proposing amendments to the Maryland Constitution increasing to 73 from 70 years the mandatory retirement age for judges under specified circumstances; proposing an addition to the Maryland Constitution to provide for the application of specified amendments to the Maryland Constitution; submitting the amendment to the qualified voters of the State for their adoption or rejection; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Constitutional Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Contingency - on a referendum
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2015
Legislative Date
2/23/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {748975/1
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Laid Over (Senator Serafini) Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {748975/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Jennings) {503429/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2015
Legislative Date
3/21/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/25/2015
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {172916/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Special Order until later today (Delegate Vallario) Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Floor Committee Amendment {393229/1 Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/23/2015 2/23/2015 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/05/2015 3/06/2015 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/06/2015 3/06/2015 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/17/2015 3/18/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/19/2015 3/19/2015 Favorable with Amendments {748975/1 46
Senate 3/19/2015 3/19/2015 Laid Over (Senator Serafini) Adopted 46
Senate 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Favorable with Amendments {748975/1 Report Adopted 47
Senate 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Floor Amendment (Senator Jennings) {503429/1 Adopted 47
Senate 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Senate 3/24/2015 3/21/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 48
House 3/25/2015 3/23/2015 First Reading Judiciary 53
House 3/25/2015 3/25/2015 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/08/2015 4/09/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/09/2015 4/03/2015 Favorable with Amendments {172916/1 Report Adopted 64
House 4/09/2015 4/03/2015 Special Order until later today (Delegate Vallario) Adopted 64
House 4/09/2015 4/03/2015 Floor Committee Amendment {393229/1 Adopted 64
House 4/09/2015 4/03/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   18B, 3, 3A, 41D, 5A )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM