Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Chesapeake Bay Water Transportation Network
Sponsored by
Senator Mathias
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Transportation and the Maryland Transit Administration to study the feasibility of using the navigable waters of Chesapeake Bay as a water transportation network to link waterfront communities along the Chesapeake Bay; requiring the Department and the Administration to prepare an inventory of specified facilities on the Chesapeake Bay and to estimate the cost of implementing the specified network; requiring a specified report be made to the Governor and General Assembly by June 30, 2019; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0907
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2017
Legislative Date
2/07/2017
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Chesapeake Bay Water Transportation Network
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/07/2017 2/07/2017 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Chesapeake Bay Water Transportation Network
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM