Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - Qualified Computer Technology
Sponsored by
Senators Hershey, Eckardt, Edwards, Hough, and Serafini
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Exempting from the sales and use tax certain sales of qualified computer technology for use at a qualified data center under certain circumstances; requiring an individual or a corporation to apply for a certain certificate of eligibility in order to qualify for the exemption; and providing for the renewal of a certain certificate.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - Qualified Computer Technology
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - Qualified Computer Technology
Senate 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-235 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM