Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Information Act - List of Contact Information for Governmental Unit Representatives
Sponsored by
Senators Young, Kagan, Klausmeier, Montgomery, and Ready
Status
Veto sustained (0-46)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring each governmental unit that maintains public records to identify a representative who a member of the public should contact to request a public record, to maintain specified contact information and post the information on the unit's Web site or keep the information in a specified place, and annually update the information and submit it to the Office of the Attorney General; and requiring the Office to post specified information on the Office's Web site and include specified information in a specified manual.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0674
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/01/0001
Legislative Date
1/21/2016
Action
Veto sustained (0-46)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2015
Legislative Date
2/24/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {794531/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2015
Legislative Date
3/21/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2015
Legislative Date
3/26/2015
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2016
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/20/2016 (Senator Pugh) Adopted
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/01/0001 1/21/2016 Veto sustained (0-46)
Senate 2/23/2015 2/24/2015 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/05/2015 3/06/2015 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/06/2015 3/06/2015 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/20/2015 3/23/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 Favorable with Amendments {794531/1 Report Adopted 47A
Senate 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47A
Senate 3/24/2015 3/21/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 48
House 3/25/2015 3/23/2015 First Reading Health and Government Operations 53
House 3/26/2015 3/26/2015 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/08/2015 4/09/2015 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/09/2015 4/03/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 64
House 4/09/2015 4/03/2015 Second Reading Passed 64
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 65
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Senate 1/13/2016 1/13/2016 Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/20/2016 (Senator Pugh) Adopted
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM