Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Utility Companies - Removal of Lines from Utility Poles
Sponsored by
Senator Ramirez
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring specified electric companies and telephone companies to coordinate with specified companies the timing of the removal of specified lines so that specified lines are removed within a specified period of time; authorizing the Public Service Commission to adopt specified regulations or issue specified orders; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1238
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2013
Legislative Date
3/11/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/14/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2013 2/07/2013 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/11/2013 3/11/2013 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/13/2013 3/14/2013 Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-215, 8-109 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM