Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commission on the Establishment of a Maryland Educators Service Memorial
Sponsored by
Senators Miller, Astle, Benson, Brinkley, Brochin, Colburn, Conway, Currie, DeGrange, Dyson, Edwards, Ferguson, Forehand, Frosh, Garagiola, Getty, Glassman, Jacobs, Jennings, Jones-Rodwell, Kasemeyer, Kelley, King, Kittleman, Klausmeier, Madaleno, Manno, Mathias, McFadden, Middleton, Montgomery, Peters, Pinsky, Pipkin, Pugh, Ramirez, Raskin, Reilly, Robey, Rosapepe, Shank, Simonaire, Stone, Young, and Zirkin
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 569
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Commission on the Establishment of a Maryland Educators Service Memorial; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Commission; requiring that the members of the Commission be appointed on or before a specified date; specifying the duties of the Commission; requiring the Commission to report its initial findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2013; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1131
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2013
Legislative Date
2/22/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2013
Legislative Date
2/22/2013
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2013
Legislative Date
3/24/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2013
Legislative Date
3/24/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 569
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2013 2/07/2013 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/22/2013 2/22/2013 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/22/2013 2/22/2013 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/15/2013 3/18/2013 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/19/2013 3/17/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 48
Senate 3/19/2013 3/17/2013 Second Reading Passed 48
Senate 3/21/2013 3/19/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 50
House 3/21/2013 3/18/2013 First Reading Ways and Means 51
House 3/21/2013 3/21/2013 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/27/2013 3/28/2013 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/28/2013 3/24/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 57
House 3/28/2013 3/24/2013 Second Reading Passed 57
House 4/02/2013 3/27/2013 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 60
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Returned Passed 60
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 569
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM