Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Eyewitness Identification - Procedures
Sponsored by
Senators Gladden, Jones-Rodwell, Kelley, and Forehand
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 201
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring, on or before January 1, 2016, each law enforcement agency in the State to adopt the Police Training Commission's Eyewitness Identification Model Policy or adopt and implement a specified policy relating to specified identification procedures and file a copy with the Department of State Police; requiring the Department, on or before February 1, 2016, to compile specified written policies; requiring the Department to allow public inspection of specified policies; applying the Act prospectively; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0986 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/17/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {238878/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Gladden) {323922/1
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Laid Over (Senator Shank) Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Gladden) {323922/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2014
Legislative Date
3/15/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2014
Legislative Date
3/18/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
4/04/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {212316/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (133-1)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendment
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/14/2014
Legislative Date
4/14/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 201
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/14/2014 3/17/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/18/2014 3/13/2014 Favorable with Amendments {238878/1 Report Adopted 47
Senate 3/18/2014 3/13/2014 Floor Amendment (Senator Gladden) {323922/1 47
Senate 3/18/2014 3/13/2014 Laid Over (Senator Shank) Adopted 47
Senate 3/19/2014 3/14/2014 Floor Amendment (Senator Gladden) {323922/1 Adopted 48
Senate 3/19/2014 3/14/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Senate 3/20/2014 3/15/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 49
House 3/21/2014 3/18/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 54
House 3/26/2014 3/26/2014 Rereferred to Judiciary
House 3/27/2014 3/27/2014 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/03/2014 4/04/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 Favorable with Amendments {212316/1 Report Adopted 64
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64
House 4/05/2014 3/29/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (133-1) 65
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Senate Concur - House Amendment 62
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 62
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Passed Enrolled 62
Post Passage 4/14/2014 4/14/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 201
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-506, 3-506.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM