Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Watershed Protection and Restoration Programs - Revisions
Sponsored by
Senators Miller, Astle, Bates, Benson, Brochin, Cassilly, Conway, Currie, DeGrange, Eckardt, Edwards, Guzzone, Hershey, Hough, Jennings, Kasemeyer, King, Klausmeier, Madaleno, Mathias, Middleton, Montgomery, Nathan-Pulliam, Peters, Pugh, Raskin, Ready, Salling, Serafini, Waugh, Zirkin, Simonaire, Young, and Rosapepe
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 124
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing the requirement that a specified county or municipality adopt and implement local laws or ordinances necessary to establish a watershed protection and restoration program; exempting a specified county from specified provisions of the Act; authorizing a specified county or municipality to adopt and implement local laws or ordinances necessary to establish a watershed protection and restoration program; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2015
Legislative Date
2/25/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2015
Legislative Date
2/27/2015
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2015
Legislative Date
2/26/2015
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {484333/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2015
Legislative Date
3/26/2015
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/10/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {940519/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Special Order until 4/11 (Delegate Stein) Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Stein) {863424/1 Adopted
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Motion vote previous question (Delegate Vaughn) Adopted
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-1)
Proceedings
70
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 124
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/24/2015 2/25/2015 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/26/2015 2/27/2015 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/26/2015 2/26/2015 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/18/2015 3/19/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/19/2015 3/19/2015 Favorable with Amendments {484333/1 Report Adopted 46
Senate 3/19/2015 3/19/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
Senate 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 47
House 3/20/2015 3/19/2015 First Reading Environment and Transportation 49
House 3/26/2015 3/26/2015 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/10/2015 4/10/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/10/2015 4/05/2015 Favorable with Amendments {940519/1 Report Adopted 66
House 4/10/2015 4/05/2015 Special Order until 4/11 (Delegate Stein) Adopted 66
House 4/11/2015 4/06/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 67
House 4/13/2015 4/09/2015 Floor Amendment (Delegate Stein) {863424/1 Adopted 70
House 4/13/2015 4/09/2015 Motion vote previous question (Delegate Vaughn) Adopted 70
House 4/13/2015 4/09/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-1) 70
Senate 4/13/2015 4/08/2015 Senate Concur - House Amendments 66
Senate 4/13/2015 4/08/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 66
Senate 4/13/2015 4/08/2015 Passed Enrolled 66
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 124
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-202.1, 4-204, 9-1601, 9-1605, 9-1605.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM