Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Juvenile Law - Juvenile Court Jurisdiction
Sponsored by
Senators Kelley, Conway, Currie, Lee, Madaleno, McFadden, Middleton, Muse, Nathan-Pulliam, Oaks, Smith, and Young
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Expanding the jurisdiction of the juvenile court by altering certain provisions of law that exclude from the jurisdiction of the juvenile court a child of a certain age alleged to have committed any of certain offenses; and making certain conforming changes in provisions of law relating to the distinction between an accessory before the fact and a principal in a crime.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1550
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Juvenile Law - Juvenile Court Jurisdiction
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Juvenile Law - Juvenile Court Jurisdiction
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/23/2018 3/23/2018 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM