Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Cooperative Housing Act - Transparency Requirements and Member Rights
Sponsored by
Senator Benson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 567
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring specified meetings of a cooperative housing corporation to be open to the members of the cooperative housing corporation or their agents; requiring the governing body of a cooperative housing corporation to keep books and records in a specified manner; establishing a specified dispute settlement mechanism for specified complaints or demands arising between specified cooperative housing corporations and their members; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1328
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/08/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/08/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
4/05/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {650514/2 Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (134-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 567
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/08/2014 3/10/2014 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/11/2014 3/08/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 42
Senate 3/11/2014 3/08/2014 Second Reading Passed 42
Senate 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 44
House 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters 46
House 3/14/2014 3/14/2014 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/19/2014 3/19/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 3/19/2014 3/19/2014 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/04/2014 4/05/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
House 4/05/2014 3/29/2014 Favorable with Amendments {650514/2 Report Adopted 65
House 4/05/2014 3/29/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65
House 4/05/2014 3/30/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (134-0) 66
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Senate Concur - House Amendments 62
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 62
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Passed Enrolled 62
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 567
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-6B-01, 5-6B-18.1 through 5-6B-18.6, 5-6B-19, 5-6B-19 through 5-6B-21, 5-6B-20, 5-6B-27, 5-6B-28 through 5-6B-31 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM