Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Solicitation for Prostitution - Fine
Sponsored by
Senators Lee, Madaleno, and Manno
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing the maximum fine to which a person is subject on conviction of procuring or soliciting or offering to procure or solicit for prostitution or assignation; altering the penalty to which a person is subject on conviction of engaging in prostitution or assignation; and requiring specified fines to be remitted to the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention to fund services for victims of human trafficking.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1089
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-306 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM