Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses, Salaries, Inspectors, and Bottle Clubs
Sponsored by
Senator Peters
Status
In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-1)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering in Prince George's County the requirements relating to residency for an alcoholic beverages license applicant acting on behalf of a sole proprietorship, a partnership, a corporation, an unincorporated association, or a limited liability company; establishing a special Sunday off-sale permit in Prince George's County; authorizing the Board of License Commissioners to issue the permit to specified license holders; establishing a fee of $450 for the special Sunday off-sale permit; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2015
Legislative Date
2/26/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {164039/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2015
Legislative Date
3/21/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/13/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {963291/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-1)
Proceedings
69
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/25/2015 2/26/2015 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/05/2015 3/06/2015 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/06/2015 3/06/2015 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/20/2015 3/23/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 Favorable with Amendments {164039/1 Report Adopted 47A
Senate 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47A
Senate 3/24/2015 3/21/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 48
House 3/25/2015 3/23/2015 First Reading Economic Matters 53
House 4/11/2015 4/13/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Favorable with Amendments {963291/1 Report Adopted 68
House 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 68
House 4/13/2015 4/08/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-1) 69
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-517, 15-109, 15-112, 20-108.1, 6-201, 9-101, 9-217 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM