Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Postconviction Review - Conviction of Human Trafficking Victim
Sponsored by
Senators Lee, Benson, Feldman, Madaleno, Manno, and Raskin
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a person to file a motion to vacate a judgment for specified convictions if the person's participation in the underlying offense was a result of the person having been a victim of human trafficking or related extortion; repealing a requirement that the State's Attorney sign a specified motion; requiring a person to provide a copy of a specified motion to the State's Attorney; authorizing the State's Attorney to respond to a specified motion; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0623
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM