Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commercial Law - Maryland Uniform Electronic Transactions Act - Revisions
Sponsored by
Senators Feldman, Astle, Benson, Hershey, Jennings, Klausmeier, Mathias, Middleton, Reilly, and Rosapepe
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that a certain consumer shall be deemed not to have agreed to enter into a certain consumer contract by electronic means or in electronic form under certain circumstances; providing the provisions of the Act do not apply to a consumer contract for a banking product or service that is subject to regulatory oversight by a state or federal financial regulatory authority; and defining certain terms.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {407675/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48B
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48B
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
48C
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Commercial Law - Maryland Uniform Electronic Transactions Act - Revisions
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments {407675/1 Adopted 48B
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48B
Text - Third - Commercial Law - Maryland Uniform Electronic Transactions Act - Revisions
Senate 3/19/2018 3/17/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 48C
House 3/20/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Economic Matters 50
House 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-101, 21-104 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM