Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Institutions of Higher Education - Restrictions on Altering Building Names
Sponsored by
Senator Benson
Status
In the Senate - Hearing cancelled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the Board of Regents of the University System of Maryland, the Board of Regents of Morgan State University, and the Board of Trustees of St. Mary's College of Maryland from changing the name of specified campus buildings without approval from the Governor and the General Assembly.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/10/2014 3/10/2014 Hearing cancelled
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-104, 14-104, 14-404 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM