Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Drug Paraphernalia Near School Property - Penalties
Sponsored by
Senator Benson
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from committing a specified crime relating to the delivery or sale of drug paraphernalia in a specified school vehicle or in, on, or within 1,000 feet of specified real property used for elementary or secondary education; establishing a penalty; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1234
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/20/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/19/2014 3/20/2014 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-619, 5-627 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM