Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Property - Foreclosure - Owner-Occupied Residential Property - Prohibition on Collection of Deficiency
Sponsored by
Senators Benson, Currie, Lee, McFadden, Muse, Ramirez, and Raskin
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a secured party from obtaining a deficiency judgment or taking any other action to collect a deficiency in an action to foreclose a mortgage or deed of trust on owner-occupied residential property that was recorded on or after October 1, 2015; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1197
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/02/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings and Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/27/2015 3/02/2015 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/05/2015 3/06/2015 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings and Finance
Senate 3/06/2015 3/06/2015 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Senate 4/02/2015 4/03/2015 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-105.13 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM