Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Fair Foreclosure Act of 2015
Sponsored by
Senators Benson, Currie, Lee, McFadden, Muse, and Ramirez
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring an action to foreclose a mortgage or deed of trust on residential property to be commenced by filing a complaint; requiring practice and procedure in an action to foreclose a mortgage or deed of trust on residential property to be governed by Title 2 of the Maryland Rules; prohibiting a foreclosure sale of residential property from occurring until at least 30 days after the court enters judgment in favor of the secured party; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1195
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/02/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/26/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/27/2015 3/02/2015 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/05/2015 3/06/2015 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/06/2015 3/06/2015 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/25/2015 3/26/2015 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-105.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM