Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Allegany County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Sales
Sponsored by
Senator Edwards
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 588
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Expanding the hours for sale of specified alcoholic beverages on Sundays by a holder of a Class D beer license, a Class D beer and light wine license, a Class B beer, wine, and liquor license, and a Class D beer, wine, and liquor license in Allegany County under specified circumstances.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0995
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/10/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/19/2016
Legislative Date
5/19/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 588
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/09/2016 3/10/2016 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 42
Senate 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 Second Reading Passed 42
Senate 3/15/2016 3/15/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 44
House 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 First Reading Economic Matters 51
House 3/31/2016 4/01/2016 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/01/2016 3/27/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 59
House 4/01/2016 3/27/2016 Second Reading Passed 59
House 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 69
Senate 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Returned Passed 66
Post Passage 5/19/2016 5/19/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 588
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-101, 9-102, 9-2002, 9-2003, 9-2004, 9-2005 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM