Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Cell Site Simulator Technology
Sponsored by
Senator Kelley
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a court to issue an order authorizing or directing a law enforcement officer to use a cell site simulator device after making a specified determination; requiring an application for a specified court order to contain specified information; requiring a law enforcement agency authorized to use a cell site simulator device in accordance with the Act to take specified actions; limiting the period of time during which information may be obtained under an order authorizing the use of a cell site simulator device; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0917
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0904 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Cell Site Simulator Technology
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Cell Site Simulator Technology
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM