Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Various Licenses
Sponsored by
Senator Edwards
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 590
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Specifying annual fees for specified alcoholic beverages licenses; altering the number of days after the expiration date of a wine festival license that a holder of a State wholesale, Class 3 winery, or Class 4 limited winery license may accept returns from a holder of a wine festival license; and providing that the Garrett County Board of License Commissioners is not required to hold a hearing before issuing specified Class C temporary licenses.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1072
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {614533/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {473993/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendment
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/19/2016
Legislative Date
5/19/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 590
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/11/2016 3/14/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/15/2016 3/15/2016 Favorable with Amendments {614533/1 Report Adopted 44
Senate 3/15/2016 3/15/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Senate 3/17/2016 3/17/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 46
House 3/17/2016 3/15/2016 First Reading Economic Matters 47
House 4/05/2016 4/06/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 4/06/2016 3/30/2016 Favorable with Amendments {473993/1 Report Adopted 62
House 4/06/2016 3/30/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
House 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0) 65
Senate 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Senate Concur - House Amendment 63
Senate 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 63
Senate 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Passed Enrolled 63
Post Passage 5/19/2016 5/19/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 590
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-1001, 21-1002, 21-102, 21-1305, 21-1309, 21-1501, 21-601, 21-602, 21-604, 21-701, 21-801, 21-802, 21-803, 21-805, 21-902, 21-903, 21-904, 21-905 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM