Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Electricity - Consumer Relations - Smart Meters
Sponsored by
Senator Kelley
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring an electric company to give specified written notice to specified customers before installing smart meters on a customer's premises under specified circumstances; specifying the contents of a specified notice; establishing a process by which a specified customer shall be deemed to have given permission to an electric company to install a smart meter; requiring an electric company to exchange a smart meter for an analog meter or an analog meter for a smart meter under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-302.1, 7-501 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM