Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Service Commission - Customer Choice Shopping Website
Sponsored by
Senator Hershey
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring the Public Service Commission to establish a customer choice website that allows electric customers to sort electricity suppliers that have open offers in a certain service area, and initiates the transition from one electricity supplier to another; specifying the contents of the website; requiring the Commission to use certain information received from an electricity supplier to maintain the information on the website; requiring the Commission to recover certain costs in a certain manner; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Service Commission - Customer Choice Shopping Website
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Public Service Commission - Customer Choice Shopping Website
Senate 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-501, 7-510.1, 7-510.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM