Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Recreational Striped Bass Fishery - Study on Harvest Data
Sponsored by
Senator Bailey
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 587
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Natural Resources to conduct a study on methods of obtaining more accurate harvest data for the recreational striped bass fishery; requiring the study to examine certain issues relevant to obtaining more accurate harvest data for the recreational striped bass fishery; requiring the Department to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and certain committees of the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2020; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1397
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Recreational Striped Bass Fishery - Study on Harvest Data
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Recreational Striped Bass Fishery - Study on Harvest Data
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
47BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 587
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Recreational Striped Bass Fishery - Study on Harvest Data
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Recreational Striped Bass Fishery - Study on Harvest Data
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/10/2020 3/10/2020 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/11/2020 3/06/2020 Favorable Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2020 3/06/2020 Second Reading Passed 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Recreational Striped Bass Fishery - Study on Harvest Data
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/13/2020 3/10/2020 Referred Environment and Transportation 47BClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 49AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Returned Passed 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 587
Text - Chapter - Recreational Striped Bass Fishery - Study on Harvest Data
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:25 PM
Click to return on the top page