Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Homeowner's Insurance - Underwriting Standards - Deductibles
Sponsored by
Senator Feldman
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the requirement that an insurer that issues a policy of homeowner's insurance file with the Maryland Insurance Commissioner for approval a specified underwriting standard that requires a specified deductible under specified circumstances before the insurer may implement the underwriting standard; requiring an insurer to file for information with the Commissioner a specified underwriting standard at least a specified period of time before the insurer proposes to implement the underwriting standard; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   19-209 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM