Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Expungement - Misdemeanor Convictions
Sponsored by
Senator Zirkin
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a person to file a petition for expungement of specified misdemeanor convictions; specifying convictions that are not eligible for expungement except under specified circumstances; authorizing a sentencing court to order specified misdemeanor convictions eligible for expungement; requiring a person to file a petition for expungement in a specified court; providing that a petition for expungement of specified misdemeanor convictions may not be filed earlier than a specified time; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2016
Legislative Date
2/09/2016
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2016 2/09/2016 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
2/09/2016 Text - First - Expungement - Misdemeanor Convictions
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM