Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax – Subtraction Modification – Entities That Provide Paid Sick Leave
Sponsored by
Senator Serafini
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing a subtraction modification under the State income tax for the first $20,000 of nonpassive income received by a member of certain pass-through entities that meet certain requirements; providing that the subtraction modification applies only to the nonpassive income of a member of an eligible pass-through entity if certain conditions are met; providing that certain individuals and married couples with federal adjusted gross income in excess of certain amounts are not eligible for the subtraction modification; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2018
Legislative Date
2/28/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2018
Legislative Date
2/28/2018
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 2:45 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 2:15 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Income Tax – Subtraction Modification – Entities That Provide Paid Sick Leave
Senate 2/28/2018 2/28/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/28/2018 2/28/2018 Hearing 3/08 at 2:45 p.m.
Senate 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Hearing 3/08 at 2:15 p.m.
Senate 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Hearing 3/08 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-208 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM