Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commission on Free Trade, Currency Manipulation, and State Sovereignty - Establishment
Sponsored by
Senator Manno
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Commission on Free Trade, Currency Manipulation, and State Sovereignty; requiring the Commission to conduct an annual assessment, provide a mechanism for input by interested persons, work with interested groups, and develop recommendations, as specified; authorizing the Commission to recommend specified legislation; requiring the Commission to submit an annual report to the Governor, Maryland Congressional Delegation, and specified committees of the General Assembly; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/03/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/03/2015 3/03/2015 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/05/2015 3/06/2015 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/06/2015 3/06/2015 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM