Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Pension Climate Change Risk Act
Sponsored by
Senator Guzzone
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 8:30 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that, consistent with certain fiduciary duties, the investment policy manual adopted by the Board of Trustees for the State Retirement and Pension System include certain policies and address certain details regarding the management of climate risks in the investment of State Retirement and Pension System assets; requiring the Board of Trustees to conduct or commission a climate risk assessment of the investments of the several systems by January 31, 2019, and every 4 years thereafter; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0993
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 8:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Pension Climate Change Risk Act
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/22 at 8:30 a.m.
Text - First - Maryland Pension Climate Change Risk Act
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM