Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Transportation - Highway Needs Inventory - Four-Lane Highways
Sponsored by
Senators Hershey and Colburn
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Highway Administration to include in the highway needs inventory a highway with two or more lanes in each direction for any county that did not have, as of January 1, 2014, a four-lane highway that fully bisects the county; and requiring the Administration to engage project planning for a highway with two or more lanes in each direction in the highway needs inventory for any county that did not have, as of January 1, 2014, a four-lane highway that fully bisects the county.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/18/2014 3/19/2014 Unfavorable Report by Finance
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-610, 8-611, 8-612 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM