Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Tree Experts - Establishment
Sponsored by
Senator Rosapepe
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the State Board of Tree Experts in the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation; providing for the composition of the Board and the qualifications, appointments, removal, terms, and expenses of the Board members; requiring the Board to adopt a code of ethics for practicing as a tree expert; prohibiting a person from practicing as a tree expert in the State without a license issued by the Board, subject to specified exceptions; establishing specified qualifications for a license; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1145
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015, October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/04/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/03/2015 3/04/2015 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/05/2015 3/06/2015 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/06/2015 3/06/2015 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   22-101 through 22-502, 22-304 )
(   5-415 through 5-423 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM