Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Residential Leases - Rental Fees - Landlord and Tenant Relations (Maryland Rental Housing Stabilization Act)
Sponsored by
Senator Ramirez
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Rental Housing Authority as an independent unit in the Executive Branch tasked with specified duties and authorized to adopt specified regulations; establishing the Office of the Tenant Advocate as an independent unit in the Executive Branch tasked with specified duties; prohibiting a landlord from increasing the rental fee on a residential unit except as authorized under the Act; establishing the Task Force on the Establishment of Regional Housing Boards; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-201, 8-208, 8-219 through 8-228 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM