Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Film Production Activity Tax Credit
Sponsored by
Senators Kasemeyer, Madaleno, Currie, DeGrange, Ferguson, Guzzone, King, Manno, McFadden, Peters, and Klausmeier
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 486
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing specified termination provisions for the tax credit allowed for specified film production activities; limiting the amount of film production activity tax credit certificates that the Secretary of Business and Economic Development may issue in fiscal years 2015 and 2016 to $7,500,000; establishing the Maryland Film Production Activity Tax Credit Reserve Fund; stating the intent of the General Assembly that the Governor include an appropriation to the Reserve Fund in the annual budget bill; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0753
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2015
Legislative Date
3/05/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {469239/1
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Special Order until 4/8 (Senator Guzzone) Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Floor Committee Amendment {949133/1 Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Klausmeier) {583325/1 Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-4)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/10/2015
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/10/2015
Action
Hearing 4/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/13/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Fisher) {123429/2 Rejected (51-80)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (84-53)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/28/2015
Legislative Date
5/30/2015
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 486
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/04/2015 3/05/2015 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/13/2015 3/16/2015 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Senate 4/03/2015 4/06/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/06/2015 3/30/2015 Favorable with Amendments {469239/1 57
Senate 4/06/2015 3/30/2015 Committee Amendment Adopted 57
Senate 4/06/2015 3/30/2015 Special Order until 4/8 (Senator Guzzone) Adopted 57
Senate 4/08/2015 4/01/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted 59
Senate 4/08/2015 4/01/2015 Floor Committee Amendment {949133/1 Adopted 59
Senate 4/08/2015 4/01/2015 Floor Amendment (Senator Klausmeier) {583325/1 Adopted 59
Senate 4/08/2015 4/01/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
Senate 4/09/2015 4/02/2015 Third Reading Passed (43-4) 60
House 4/09/2015 4/03/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 64
House 4/10/2015 4/10/2015 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 4/10/2015 4/10/2015 Hearing 4/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/11/2015 4/13/2015 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 68
House 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Second Reading Passed 68
House 4/13/2015 4/08/2015 Floor Amendment (Delegate Fisher) {123429/2 Rejected (51-80) 69
House 4/13/2015 4/08/2015 Third Reading Passed (84-53) 69
Senate 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Returned Passed 65
Post Passage 5/28/2015 5/30/2015 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 486
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-730 )
(   2011, 2013 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM