Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Ironworkers - Apprenticeship Program and Certification Program and Use of Certified Ironworkers on Construction Projects
Sponsored by
Senator Klausmeier
Status
In the Senate - Hearing cancelled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, on or before December 31, 2015, to adopt regulations establishing an apprenticeship program for nonexperienced ironworkers, in consultation with the Maryland Apprenticeship and Training Council, and establishing a certification program for experienced ironworkers; requiring the Department to consult with specified persons before adopting the regulations; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
Rereferred to Finance and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2015
Legislative Date
3/12/2015
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/25/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/05/2015 3/06/2015 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/09/2015 3/09/2015 Rereferred to Finance and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/12/2015 3/12/2015 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Senate 3/25/2015 3/25/2015 Hearing cancelled
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM