Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Transportation - Harry W. Nice Memorial Potomac River Bridge - Replacement
Sponsored by
Senators Middleton, Astle, Conway, DeGrange, Ferguson, Gladden, Guzzone, Kagan, King, Klausmeier, Madaleno, Manno, McFadden, Miller, Muse, Nathan-Pulliam, Peters, Pugh, Ramirez, Raskin, Rosapepe, Zirkin, Zucker, Benson, Feldman, and Kelley
Status
Veto sustained (0-45)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Attorney General's Review Letter
Synopsis
Requiring the State and the Maryland Transportation Authority to finance a replacement bridge for the Harry W. Nice Memorial Potomac River Bridge; establishing the Harry W. Nice Memorial Potomac River Bridge Replacement Fund; requiring the Authority to make a deposit to the Fund of $75,000,000 in fiscal years 2018 through 2027, to finance the design and construction of the replacement bridge; authorizing the Authority to deposit in the Fund an amount less than the specified required amount under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0672
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {187474/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (30-14)
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/20/2016
Action
First Reading Appropriations and Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/11/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {374866/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Szeliga) {843820/1 Rejected (52-85)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Motion Special Order until later today (Delegate Parrott) Withdrawn
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Buckel) {153227/2 Rejected (52-85)
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Kipke) {323126/1 Rejected (50-89)
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate O'Donnell) {343421/1 Rejected (47-91)
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Special Order until later today (Delegate Kaiser) Adopted
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (90-50)
Proceedings
70
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (33-12)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/31/2016
Legislative Date
5/27/2016
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2017
Legislative Date
2/02/2017
Action
Motion Special Order vote on veto until 4/7 (Senator Middleton) Adopted
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/10/2017
Action
Veto sustained (0-45)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/19/2016 3/21/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 Favorable with Amendments {187474/1 Report Adopted 47A
Senate 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47A
Senate 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 Third Reading Passed (30-14) 48A
House 3/22/2016 3/20/2016 First Reading Appropriations and Environment and Transportation 52
House 3/23/2016 3/23/2016 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
House 4/01/2016 4/01/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 4/01/2016 4/01/2016 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
House 4/11/2016 4/11/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Favorable with Amendments {374866/1 Report Adopted 69
House 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Floor Amendment (Delegate Szeliga) {843820/1 Rejected (52-85) 69
House 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 69
House 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Motion Special Order until later today (Delegate Parrott) Withdrawn 70
House 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Floor Amendment (Delegate Buckel) {153227/2 Rejected (52-85) 70
House 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Floor Amendment (Delegate Kipke) {323126/1 Rejected (50-89) 70
House 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Floor Amendment (Delegate O'Donnell) {343421/1 Rejected (47-91) 70
House 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Special Order until later today (Delegate Kaiser) Adopted 70
House 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (90-50) 70
Senate 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Senate Concur - House Amendments 67
Senate 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Third Reading Passed (33-12) 67
Senate 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Passed Enrolled 67
Post Passage 5/31/2016 5/27/2016 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Senate 2/02/2017 2/02/2017 Motion Special Order vote on veto until 4/7 (Senator Middleton) Adopted
Senate 4/10/2017 4/10/2017 Veto sustained (0-45)
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
3/21/2016 Amendments Senate - (Finance) {187474/01 Adopted
4/11/2016 Amendments House - (Delegate Buckel) {153227/02 Rejected
4/11/2016 Amendments House - (Delegate Kipke) {323126/01 Rejected
4/11/2016 Amendments House - (Delegate O'Donnell) {343421/01 Rejected
4/11/2016 Amendments House - (Appropriations) {374866/01 Adopted
4/11/2016 Amendments House - (Delegate Szeliga) {843820/01 Rejected
2/09/2016 Text - First - Transportation - Harry W. Nice Memorial Potomac River Bridge - Replacement
3/21/2016 Text - Third - Transportation - Harry W. Nice Memorial Potomac River Bridge - Replacement
4/13/2016 Text - Enrolled - Transportation - Harry W. Nice Memorial Potomac River Bridge - Replacement
9/19/2016 Governor's Veto Letter
3/21/2016 Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
4/11/2016 Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
4/11/2016 Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
3/19/2016 Vote - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (30-14) - 03/19/16
4/07/2016 Vote - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (33-12) - 04/07/16
4/06/2016 Vote - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Szeliga) {843820/1 Rejected (52-85) - 04/06/16
4/07/2016 Vote - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Buckel) {153227/2 Rejected (52-85) - 04/07/16
4/07/2016 Vote - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Kipke) {323126/1 Rejected (50-89) - 04/07/16
4/07/2016 Vote - House Floor - Floor Amendment (O'Donnell) {343421/1 Rejected (47-91) - 04/07/16
4/07/2016 Vote - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (90-50) - 04/07/16
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM